Tara Reid et al v. Asylum Entertainment, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tara Reid and Hi Happy Flims, Inc.
Defendant: SyFy Media Productions, LLC, Shamrocky, LLC., Fells Point, LLC., Asylum Entertainment, LLC, Aristocrat Technologies, Inc., Fells Point Productions, LLC. and The Global Asylum, inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10171
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
December 18, 2018 Filing 31 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 as to Defendant Fells Point, LLC.. (bp)
December 18, 2018 Filing 30 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 as to Defendant Fells Point Productions, LLC.. (bp)
December 18, 2018 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 as to Defendant Shamrocky, LLC.. (bp)
December 18, 2018 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 as to Defendant SyFy Media Productions, LLC. (bp)
December 18, 2018 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 as to Defendant Aristocrat Technologies, Inc.. (bp)
December 18, 2018 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 as to Defendant The Global Asylum, inc.. (bp)
December 16, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Tara Reid pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Asylum Entertainment, LLC. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 16, 2018 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 16, 2018 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 16, 2018 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 16, 2018 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 16, 2018 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 16, 2018 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 16, 2018 Filing 18 Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 16, 2018 Filing 17 First Amended Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Tara Reid (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Aristocrat Technologies, Inc., Asylum Entertainment, LLC, Fells Point Productions, LLC., Fells Point, LLC., Shamrocky, LLC., SyFy Media Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Aristocrat, #2 Fells Point LLC, #3 Fells Point Productions, #4 Shamrocky, LLC, #5 SYFY Media) (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party Hi Happy Flims, Inc.(pty:pla))(Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tara Reid. (Franceschi, Ernest)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22855143 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tara Reid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party Tara Reid(pty:pla))(Franceschi, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tara Reid et al v. Asylum Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Reid
Represented By: Ernest J Franceschi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hi Happy Flims, Inc.
Represented By: Ernest J Franceschi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SyFy Media Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamrocky, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fells Point, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asylum Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristocrat Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fells Point Productions, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Global Asylum, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?