Shason, Inc. v. Oren Ben Hamo et al

Plaintiff: Shason, Inc.
Defendant: Oren Ben Hamo, M.J. Impex, DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive and L'Patricia MH LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv10172
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the following docket entry has been corrected as indicated below. Re: Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE)(AO 121) #12 , Filed date: 1/14/19. Other: Copyright Closing should not have been docketed and submitted to the Copyright Office, since the Notice of Dismissal only referred to a certain party. (bm)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the following docket entry has been corrected as indicated below. Re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #11 . Other: Only party L'Patricia MH LLC (a Texas limited liability company) should have been dismissed, not entire case. Case reopened. (bm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (bm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Shason, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to L'Patricia MH LLC. (Knox, Stacey)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shason, Inc., upon Defendant L'Patricia MH LLC served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Baum, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Oren Ben Hamo, L'Patricia MH LLC and M.J. Impex. (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Shason, Inc.. (Baum, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shason, Inc., identifying Shason, Inc.; Oren Ben Hamo d/b/a Oren's Outlet; L'Patricia MH LLC; M.J. Impex. (Baum, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Shason, Inc.. (Baum, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shason, Inc.. (Baum, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22855238 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Shason, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Design, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration of Design, #3 Exhibit 3 - Photographs of Garment) (Attorney Michael Charles Baum added to party Shason, Inc.(pty:pla))(Baum, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shason, Inc. v. Oren Ben Hamo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oren Ben Hamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.J. Impex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Patricia MH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shason, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Baum
Represented By: Andrew V Jablon
Represented By: Stacey N Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?