Dianne King v. Marriott International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dianne King
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10173
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Dale S Fischer
1 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SUSPEND PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION BY JPML #19 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 14, 2019 19 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Decision by JPML filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Matthias in Support of Stipulation to Suspend Proceedings Pending Decision by JPML, #2 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Suspend Proceedings Pending Decision by JPML)(Matthias, Michael)
January 11, 2019 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Dianne King. upon Marriott International, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Lisa M. Ghannoum. (Warshaw, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 17 NOTICE of (1) Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings; and (2) Petition to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, List of Pending Actions)(Matthias, Michael)
January 4, 2019 16 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-10490-AB-AGR, 5:18-cv-02545-DSF-MRW, 2:18-cv-10034-DSF-MRW, 2:18-cv-10234- DSF-MRW, 2:18-cv-10324-DSF-MRW, and 2:18-cv-10390-DSF-MRW (Matthias, Michael)
January 3, 2019 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael R Matthias counsel for Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. Adding Michael R. Matthias as counsel of record for Marriott International, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. (Attorney Michael R Matthias added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Matthias, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S Weiner's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dianne King, designating Daniel L Warshaw as local counsel. (lom)
December 18, 2018 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc., (Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chow, Teresa)
December 17, 2018 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dianne King (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22908446) filed by Plaintiff Dianne King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Warshaw, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10034 DSF (MRWx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-10173 DSF (MRWx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (esa)
December 10, 2018 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S Weiner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 10, 2018 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Marriott International, Inc. (ghap)
December 10, 2018 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
December 6, 2018 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Dianne King. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-10034 (Warshaw, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dianne King, (Warshaw, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dianne King. (Warshaw, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dianne King. (Warshaw, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22855361 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dianne King. (Attorney Daniel L Warshaw added to party Dianne King(pty:pla))(Warshaw, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dianne King v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne King
Represented By: Daniel L Warshaw
Represented By: Melissa S Weiner
Represented By: Alexander Lee Simon
Represented By: Joseph C Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Matthias
Represented By: Teresa C Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?