Chris Langer v. O.C.P. LP et al

Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10 and O.C.P. LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv10175
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant O.C.P. LP served on 1/27/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: KEVIN J MOORE in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kss)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant O.C.P. LP. (et)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22855852 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Langer v. O.C.P. LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.C.P. LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?