Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd. v. Jia Yueting
Petitioner: Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.
Respondent: Jia Yueting
Case Number: 2:2018cv10255
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Opposition and Petitioner's Reply to the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Extension of TRO filed by respondent Jia Yueting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schecter, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney R Peter Durning, Jr counsel for Respondent Jia Yueting. Adding R. Peter Durning, Jr. as counsel of record for Jia Yueting for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by respondent Jia Yueting. (Attorney R Peter Durning, Jr added to party Jia Yueting(pty:res))(Durning, R)
January 31, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by respondent Jia Yueting, identifying Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.; Jia Yueting; LeTV Sports Culture Develop (Beijing) Co., Ltd.; TV Plus Holdings (Beijing) Limited. (Schecter, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Scott Schecter counsel for Respondent Jia Yueting. Adding Daniel Scott Schecter as counsel of record for Jia Yueting for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by respondent Jia Yueting. (Attorney Daniel Scott Schecter added to party Jia Yueting(pty:res))(Schecter, Daniel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Han to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 1/18/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23067880) filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevens, Bethany)
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for First Extension of Temporary Protective Order filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Stevens, Bethany)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Han to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23067880) filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevens, Bethany)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Christopher S. Cogburn re: Waiver of Service of Temporary Protective Order filed by Petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Cogburn, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. upon Jia Yueting waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. Waiver of Service signed by R. Peter Durning, Jr.. (Stevens, Bethany)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher S. Cogburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd. and designating Bethany M Stevens as local counsel by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher S. Cogburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22914185) filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevens, Bethany)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING IN PART EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF #5 .The Court GRANTS Petitionera Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO"), freezing certain of Respondent's assets in this jurisdiction pending the outcome of this litigation. The Court DENIES Petitioner's request for a Right-To- Attach order. (lc)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Cogburn. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Jia Yueting. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Right-to-Attach Order and Writ of Attachment or, in the Alternative, for Temporary Protective Order filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Jian Kang [Second], #3 Exhibit 1 to Second Kang Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Second Kang Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Second Kang Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Second Kang Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Second Kang Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 1) to Second Kang Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 (Part 2) to Second Kang Declaration, #10 Proposed Order for Right-to-Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, #11 Proposed Order in the Alternative, for Temporary Protective Order) (Stevens, Bethany)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Stevens, Bethany)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd., (Stevens, Bethany)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Stevens, Bethany)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award Receipt No: 0973-22871778 - Fee: $400, filed by petitioner Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Jian Kang, #3 Exhibit 1 to Kang Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Kang Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Kang Declaration) (Attorney Bethany M Stevens added to party Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.(pty:pet))(Stevens, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd. v. Jia Yueting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shanghai Lan Cai Asset Management Co, Ltd.
Represented By: Bethany M Stevens
Represented By: Christopher Cogburn
Represented By: Daniel A Zaheer
Represented By: John Han
Represented By: Amanda N Walker
Represented By: Michael K Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jia Yueting
Represented By: Daniel Scott Schecter
Represented By: R Peter Durning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?