Eliza S. Ahn v. The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Eliza S. Ahn
Defendant: The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, a Federal Agency, DOES 1 through 100, inclusive and The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2018cv10293
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service answer now due 2/27/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service.(Pribe, Andrew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eliza S. Ahn, upon Defendant The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service served on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F De La Rosa, Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase, title unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Peters, Duke)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 2/11/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
December 12, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 100, inclusive, The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service., filed by plaintiff Eliza S. Ahn. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/27/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, a Federal Agency. (Pribe, Andrew)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18VECV00220 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, a Federal Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Andrew Pribe added to party The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, a Federal Agency(pty:dft))(Pribe, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eliza S. Ahn v. The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliza S. Ahn
Represented By: Duke L Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, a Federal Agency
Represented By: Andrew Pribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Andrew Pribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?