Suzanna Sukiasyan v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Suzanna Sukiasyan
Defendant: Target Corporation, Starbucks Corporation and Does 1 to 12
Case Number: 2:2018cv10356
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amendment to Complaint and Order Remanding to State Court #11 filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Farley, #2 Declaration of Flavio Gomez, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proof of Service)(Farley, Jessica)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: The name of the withdrawing attorney is not indicated on the form in the space provided, however, it appears to be attorney John W. Phillips. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Substitute Attorney #6 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(Yaghoubtil, Farid)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Suzanna Sukiasyan, re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amendment to Complaint and Order Remanding to State Court #11 served on 01/15/2019. (Yaghoubtil, Farid)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amendment to Complaint and Order Remanding to State Court filed by PLAINTIFF Suzanna Sukiasyan. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for an Order Remanding to State Court, #2 Declaration Declaration of Igor Fradkin in Support of Motion for Order Remanding to State Court, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion of Leave to Amend Complaint and to Remand to State Court) (Yaghoubtil, Farid)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Manuel L. Real. The document is stricken. Counsel shall re-file the Notice of Motion and Motion under the correct event as directed in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #9 , on or before January 16, 2019. Counsel shall set the motion for hearing in compliance with Local Rule 6-1, and this Court's Order Re: Notice to Counsel. Counsel shall properly submit a proposed order. Upon re-filing, mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered to chambers. This shall be completed on or before January 16, 2019. See Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #9 . (cch)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other), #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand Case to State Court. The filer used the event, Notice (Other), for docketing this filing, which does not prompt to filer to set the hearing date. The filed noticed the motion for an untimely hearing date of 2/4/2019 at 10:00 AM, Local Rule 6-1. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Substitute Attorney #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to a Notice of Lodging, Local Rule 5-4.4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 *STRICKEN* NOTICE filed by PLAINTIFF Suzanna Sukiasyan. Motion for Leave to file Amendment to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for an Order Remanding to State Court, #2 Declaration Declaration of Igor Fradkin in Support of Motion for Order Remanding to State Court)(Yaghoubtil, Farid) Modified on 1/14/2019 (cch).
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Substitute attorney Igor Fradkin in place of attorney John Winston Phillips filed by Plaintiff Suzanna Sukiasyan.(Attorney Farid Yaghoubtil added to party Suzanna Sukiasyan(pty:pla))(Yaghoubtil, Farid)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Target Corporation, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on 12/18/18. (Burnett, Sean)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Target Corporation, identifying Suzanna Sukiasyan, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Burnett, Sean)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Burnett, Sean)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC707949 Receipt No: 0973-22896028 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Form Interrogatories (Set One), #4 Exhibit Request for Statement of Damages, #5 Exhibit November 14, 2018 Email, #6 Exhibit Statement of Damages, #7 Proof of Service) (Attorney Sean R Burnett added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft))(Burnett, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suzanna Sukiasyan v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Sean R Burnett
Represented By: Jessica Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanna Sukiasyan
Represented By: Ronald R Heard
Represented By: Igor Fradkin
Represented By: John Winston Phillips
Represented By: Farid Yaghoubtil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?