Alfonso Ribeiro v. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro alleged that Defendants Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., 2K Games, Inc. and Visual Concepts Entertainment have infringed on Plaintiff's copyrights by selling an in-game dance to the NBA 2K16 game that allows the user's avatar to perform the Carlton Dance.

Plaintiff: Alfonso Ribeiro
Defendant: 2K Sports, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. and 2K Games, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10417
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, re Physical Exhibits B, C, E, F, H, I, J and K to #49 Cendali Declaration served on February 13, 2019. (McKeown, Megan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment of Exhibits B, C, E, F, H, I, J and K to the Cendali Declaration re #49 Motion to Dismiss. (Cendali, Dale)
February 13, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Dale M. Cendali, #4 Exhibit A - Variation A Copyright Application Form - 1-7225814191, #5 Exhibit B - Variation A Deposit, #6 Exhibit C - Excerpt of Variation A Deposit, #7 Exhibit D - Variation B Copyright Application Form - 1-7226013290, #8 Exhibit E - Variation B Deposit, #9 Exhibit F - Excerpt of Variation B Deposit, #10 Exhibit G - Variation C Copyright Application Form - 1-7226013364, #11 Exhibit H - Variation C Deposit, #12 Exhibit I - Fresh Prince of Bel-Air - Season 2, Episode 13, #13 Exhibit J - NBA 2K18 for XBox One, #14 Exhibit K - NBA 2K18 So Fresh Ritual, #15 Exhibit L - Variation A Copyright Office Correspondence - 1-7225814191, #16 Exhibit M - Variation B Copyright Office Correspondence - 1-7226013290, #17 Exhibit N - Variation C Copyright Office Correspondence - 1-7226013364, #18 Proposed Order, #19 Certificate of Service) (Cendali, Dale)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #40 GRANTING of Dale M. Cendali on behalf of Defendants, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., 2K Games, and Visual Concepts Entertainment, designating Sharre Lotfollahi as local counsel, by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (bp) .
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #39 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Alfonso Ribiero, designating Carolynn K. Beck as local counsel. (bp)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #33 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Yi Wen Wu APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Alfonso Ribiero, designating Carolynn K. Beck as local counsel. (bp)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #31 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Alfonso Ribiero, designating Carolynn K. Beck as local counsel. (bp) .
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #29 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Shanti S. Conway APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., 2K Games, and Visual Concepts Entertainment, designating Sharre Lotfollahi as local counsel. (bp)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #30 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. McKeown APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., 2K Games, and Visual Concepts Entertainent, designating Sharre Lotfollahi as local counsel. (bp)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #28 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Simmons APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., 2K Games, and Visual Concepts Entertainent, designating Sharre Lotfollahi as local counsel. (bp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 41 Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanti Sadtler Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Recei #29 Corrected Application filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Lotfollahi, Sharre)
January 7, 2019 Filing 40 Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. #27 Corrected Application filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Lotfollahi, Sharre)
January 4, 2019 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 1/2/2019, Receipt No. 26EGBGVB) filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beck, Carolynn)
January 4, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. #27 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 1/8/19. (bp)
January 4, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979592) #32 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 1/8/19. (bp)
January 3, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979592) #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application has listed parties that are not a party to this action. Proposed Order lists the parties to the case. (lt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. #27 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanti Sadtler Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Recei #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed.. (lt)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #26 . Defendants shall file their responses to the complaint on or before February 13, 2019. (sw)
January 2, 2019 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yi Wen Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979593) filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beck, Carolynn)
January 2, 2019 Filing 32 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #37] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979592) filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beck, Carolynn) Modified on 1/4/2019 (bp).
January 2, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979591) filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beck, Carolynn)
January 2, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. McKeown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979505) filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lotfollahi, Sharre)
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanti Sadtler Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979497) filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lotfollahi, Sharre)
January 2, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979479) filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lotfollahi, Sharre)
January 2, 2019 Filing 27 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #38] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22979465) filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lotfollahi, Sharre) Modified on 1/4/2019 (bp).
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 25, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lotfollahi, Sharre)
January 2, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, identifying The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party 2K Games, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party 2K Sports, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party Visual Concepts Entertainment(pty:dft))(Lotfollahi, Sharre)
December 31, 2018 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro, upon Defendant Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Registered Agent, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 31, 2018 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro, upon Defendant Visual Concepts Entertainment served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Registered Agent, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 31, 2018 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro, upon Defendant 2K Sports, Inc. served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Registered Agent, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 31, 2018 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro, upon Defendant 2K Games, Inc. served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Registered Agent, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (pg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Visual Concepts Entertainment. (bp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (bp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 2K Sports, Inc.. (bp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 2K Games, Inc.. (bp)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro, (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22905826 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Attorney Carolynn Kyungwon Beck added to party Alfonso Ribeiro(pty:pla))(Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22905826 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Attorney Carolynn Kyungwon Beck added to party Alfonso Ribeiro(pty:pla))(Beck, Carolynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfonso Ribeiro v. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2K Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M Cendali
Represented By: Joshua L Simmons
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Megan L McKeown
Represented By: Shanti S Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visual Concepts Entertainment
Represented By: Dale M Cendali
Represented By: Joshua L Simmons
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Megan L McKeown
Represented By: Shanti S Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M Cendali
Represented By: Joshua L Simmons
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Megan L McKeown
Represented By: Shanti S Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2K Games, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M Cendali
Represented By: Joshua L Simmons
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Megan L McKeown
Represented By: Shanti S Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Ribeiro
Represented By: Carolynn Kyungwon Beck
Represented By: John Mark Pierce
Represented By: David L Hecht
Represented By: Yi Wen Wu
Represented By: Daniel Dubin
Represented By: Maxim Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?