Mario Arguijo v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Mario Arguijo
Defendant: floyd edward travis, Jr, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,, united states postal service and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv10498
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole E Hoikka counsel for Plaintiff Mario Arguijo. Nicole E. Hoikka is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Attorney Nicole E Hoikka added to party Mario Arguijo(pty:pla))(Hoikka, Nicole)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Floyd Edward Travis, Jr. (gk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant United States of America. (twdb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 17 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant United States Postal Service. (gk)
December 22, 2018 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Glickman, Steven)
December 22, 2018 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Glickman, Steven)
December 22, 2018 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Glickman, Steven)
December 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Mario Arguijo. correcting Summons Request #11 United States Postal Service (Glickman, Steven)
December 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Mario Arguijo. correcting Summons Request #10 as to United States of America (Glickman, Steven)
December 22, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Glickman, Steven)
December 22, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Glickman, Steven)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (jre)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Complaint filed by plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Glickman, Steven)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Glickman, Steven)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mario Arguijo, identifying Gallagher Bassett. (Glickman, Steven)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mario Arguijo. (Glickman, Steven)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22919680 - Fee: $400, filed by plainitff Mario Arguijo. (Attorney Steven C Glickman added to party Mario Arguijo(pty:pla))(Glickman, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mario Arguijo v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: floyd edward travis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: united states postal service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Arguijo
Represented By: Steven C Glickman
Represented By: Nicole E Hoikka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?