Antonio Ramirez Rodriguez v. Joe Lizaraga
Petitioner: Antonio Ramirez Rodriguez and Luis Vega
Respondent: Joe Lizaraga
Case Number: 2:2018cv10500
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 OPPOSITION to: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #6 filed by Petitioner Antonio Ramirez Rodriguez. (sbou)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING IN 24 U.S.C. SECTION 2254 CASE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #6 (Attachments: #1 LD1 - Petitioner's Opening Brief, #2 LD2 - Respondent's Brief, #3 LD3 - Petitioner's Reply Brief, #4 LD4 - Petitioner's Supplemental Letter Brief, #5 LD5 - Respondent's Supplemental Letter Brief, #6 LD6 - CA COA Opinion, #7 LD7 - Petitioner's Petition for Review, #8 LD8 - Cal. Supreme Court Denial Order)(Nguyen, Taylor)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Respondent Joe Lizaraga. (Nguyen, Taylor)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Taylor Nguyen, Deputy Attorney General, on behalf of Respondent Joe Lizaraga. (Attorney Taylor T Nguyen added to party Joe Lizaraga(pty:res))(Nguyen, Taylor)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 filing fee from Luis Vega. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #1 . Receipt number LA182078. (ek)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. that Respondent Joe Lizaraga file Answer to the Petition not later than 2/4/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Filing fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Antonio Ramirez Rodriguez. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Ramirez Rodriguez v. Joe Lizaraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe Lizaraga
Represented By: Taylor T Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Ramirez Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?