William N. McGrane et al v. Cathay Bank

Plaintiff: William McGrane, William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989, Sherrill McGrane, William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane
Defendant: Cathay Bank
Interested Party: Cathay General Bancorp and Old Republic Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv10608
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #17 filed by Defendant Cathay Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal, #2 Exhibit Regulations, #3 Proposed Order)(Grumer, Carl)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Cathay Bank. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #16 (Grumer, Carl)
February 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cathay Bank. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grumer, Carl)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cathay Bank. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Grumer, Carl)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendant Cathay Bank to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint shall be extended fifteen (15) days, to and including February 15, 2019. (iv)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cathay Bank answer now due 2/15/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Defendant Cathay Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Carl L Grumer added to party Cathay Bank(pty:dft))(Grumer, Carl)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #11 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The request of William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane to substitute Daniel J. Mulligan as attorney of record instead of William N. McGrane and Mathew Sepuya is GRANTED. (iv)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Daniel J. Mulligan in place of attorney William N. McGrane filed by Plaintiff Sherrill A. McGrane(individually), Sherrill A. McGrane(in their respective capacities as Trustees U.D.T. of the William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989). (Mulligan, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Daniel J. Mulligan in place of attorney William N. McGrane filed by Plaintiffs Sherrill A. McGrane(individually), Sherrill A. McGrane(in their respective capacities as Trustees U.D.T. of the William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989), William N. McGrane, William McGrane. (Attorney Daniel J Mulligan added to party Sherrill A. McGrane(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel J Mulligan added to party Sherrill A. McGrane(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel J Mulligan added to party William N. McGrane(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel J Mulligan added to party William McGrane(pty:pla)) (Mulligan, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant Cathay Bank. (iv)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Sherrill A. McGrane(individually), Sherrill A. McGrane(in their respective capacities as Trustees U.D.T. of the William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989), William N. McGrane, William McGrane. (McGrane, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 FIRST Amended Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Sherrill A. McGrane(individually), William N. McGrane, Sherrill A. McGrane(in their respective capacities as Trustees U.D.T. of the William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989), William McGrane(McGrane, William)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cathay Bank. (et)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Sherrill McGrane, William McGrane, William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989, identifying Cathay General Bancorp; Old Republic Title Insurance Company; Cathay Bank; William N. McGrane; Sherrill A. McGrane; William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989. (McGrane, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Sherrill McGrane, William McGrane, William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989. (McGrane, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Sherrill McGrane, William McGrane, William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989. (McGrane, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22942059 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989, Sherrill McGrane, William McGrane. (Attorney William McGrane added to party Sherrill McGrane(pty:pla), Attorney William McGrane added to party William McGrane(pty:pla), Attorney William McGrane added to party William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989(pty:pla))(McGrane, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William N. McGrane et al v. Cathay Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McGrane
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Matthew S Sepuya
Represented By: Daniel J Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William N. McGrane and Sherrill A. McGrane Declaration of Trust Dated February 2, 1989
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrill McGrane
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William N. McGrane
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Matthew S Sepuya
Represented By: Daniel J Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrill A. McGrane
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Matthew S Sepuya
Represented By: Daniel J Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cathay General Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Old Republic Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathay Bank
Represented By: Carl L Grumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?