Data Scape Limited v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10659
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Apple Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Mirzaie, Reza)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-10653 CBM(SKx) (rn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Apple Inc., (James, Clayton)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (James, Clayton)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple Inc. answer now due 3/1/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Apple Inc..(Attorney Clayton Cole James added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft))(James, Clayton)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, upon Defendant Apple Inc. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon GABRIELA SANCHEZ, INTAKE SPECIALIST, CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge John A. Kronstadt (lc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apple Inc. (et)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Patent Report AO 120)(Mirzaie, Reza)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22953562 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Data Scape Limited v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: C Jay Chung
Represented By: Paul A Kroeger
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Philip X Wang
Represented By: Brian D Ledahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Clayton Cole James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?