Nancy Eileen Delange v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Nancy Eileen Delange
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv10691
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 POS)(Attorney Jennifer A Kenney added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Kenney, Jennifer)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nancy Eileen Delange, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (sbou)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Plaintiff Nancy Eileen Delange. (sbou)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Social Security) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbou)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. NOTE: BECAUSE PLAINTIFF IS PROCEEDING IN PRO PER, THIS CASE IS NOT SUBJECT TO ELECTRONIC FILING PROCEDURES. FURTHER, THIS ORDER DIFFERS IN VARIOUS RESPECTS FROM THE COURT'S USUAL SOCIAL SECURITY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (See document for details.) (sbou)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (jtil)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nancy Eileen Delange. (jtil)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Nancy A. Berryhill filed against Defendant Nancy Eileen Delange. Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nancy Eileen Delange v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Eileen Delange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer A Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?