In Re: Real Estate Short Sales Inc.

Appellee: Real Estate Short Sales Inc.
Appellant: Nancy A. Cueva, Julio C. Molica, Nancy Amparo Cueva and Julio C Molica
Case Number: 2:2018cv10742
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION (DKT. #9 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE WITH THE CLERK OF CENTRAL DISTRICT COURT AN EXTENSION TO FILE A DESIGNATION OF RECORD A STATEMENT OF ISSUES ON APPEAL AND A NOTICE REGARDING THE ORDERING OF TRANSCRIPTS. THE DECLARATION OF APPELLANT NANCY A. CUEVA IN SUPPORT THEREOF, Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica. (bp)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica. Amendment to Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form #4 (bp)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE TO: UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (bp)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10689 DSF. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-10742 DSF. Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Transfer of Appeal to District Court. (jtil)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/28/2018. (jtil)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellants Julio C. Molica and Nancy A. Cueva Re: Order Determining Quitclaim Deed Recorded 12/26/18 Null and Void and Authorizing and Directing First American Title Company entered on 12/27/2018 by Bankruptcy Judge Geraldine Mund, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/28/2018. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:16-bk-11387, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: CC-18-01336. #1 BK Docket) (jtil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Real Estate Short Sales Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Real Estate Short Sales Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Represented By: Stephen L Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nancy A. Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julio C. Molica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nancy Amparo Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julio C Molica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?