Louie Ronquillo v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Louie Ronquillo
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00207
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Louie Ronquillo(Perlman, Douglas)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #15 , the Court orders that Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint on or before 2/22/2019. After Plaintiff files his First Amended Complaint, Defendant shall have 21 days to file its response to the same. (gk)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 18, 2019 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGeever, Amy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Louie Ronquillo, (Perlman, Douglas)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Jury Demand #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Louie Ronquillo.. (Perlman, Douglas)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 2/15/2019, filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(McGeever, Amy)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
January 9, 2019 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Louie Ronquillo, upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 11/19/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Brian Fahy, Counsel. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
January 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Louie Ronquillo. (Filed in state court 11/15/2018, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 24) (esa)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Battenfeld, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., served on 01/09/19. (Battenfeld, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Battenfeld, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Battenfeld, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., (Battenfeld, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Battenfeld, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV05155 Receipt No: 0973-23018401 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration Peter Nickerson in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal) (Attorney John S Battenfeld added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Battenfeld, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louie Ronquillo v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louie Ronquillo
Represented By: Farzad Rastegar
Represented By: Douglas Walter Perlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: John S Battenfeld
Represented By: Amy A McGeever
Represented By: Brian D Fahy
Represented By: Andrea L Fellion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?