People of the State of California v. The Sherwin-Williams Company et al

Plaintiff: South Coast Air Quality Management District and People of the State of California
Defendant: Sherwin-Williams Company The, The Sherwin-Williams Company and Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00234
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
1 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from April 1, 2019 to To Be Determined, STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wong, William)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order re: reply brief by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: If Defendant The Sherwin Williams Company wishes to file a reply brief responding to Plaintiff the People of the State of California ex rel. South Coast Air Quality Management District's arguments for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, it may do so no later than March 15, 2019. The brief should not exceed 12 pages in length. (bm)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff People of the State of California to Order to Show Cause and Defendant's Response Thereto (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William B. Wong)(Wong, William)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order re: Order to Show Cause by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Plaintiff the People of the State of California ex rel. South Coast Air Quality Management District ("Plaintiff") is ORDERED to file a brief expressing its views on whether the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. Specifically, Plaintiff is instructed to address the issues raised by the Court in its Order to Show Cause (Dkt. no. 13) and the arguments made by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company in response to the OSC (Dkt. no. 16). Plaintiff's brief should not exceed 25 pages in length and must be filed no later than March 5, 2019. (bm)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Companyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #13 (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1-4 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 5-7 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 8-11 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Thurlow, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement, #2 Exhibit to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company's Motion to Dismiss, Or, In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement) (Thurlow, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company, of Court Documents served on January 10, 2019 and January 16, 2019. (Thurlow, Matthew)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re Order to Show Cause re: lack of subject matter jurisdiction by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: For the foregoing reasons, the Court cannot determine from the current submissions whether it has jurisdiction over this matter. Accordingly, Defendant is ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than February 15, 2019 why federal jurisdiction exists. Failure to respond by this date will result in the case being remanded to state court. (see document for further details) (bm)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) granting Stipulation #8 , by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant shall have until February 12, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (bm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 e-mailed to Matthew David Thurlow at matthew.thurlow@lw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'#5.1.0 Address rejected. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to mthurlow@bakerlaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on January 10, 2019. (Thurlow, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Sherwin-Williams Company answer now due 2/12/2019, filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not More Than 30 Days)(Thurlow, Matthew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect Document is Attached. Notice of Removal caption does not match complaint caption verbatim. (ghap)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, The Sherwin-Williams Company., filed by plaintiff People of the State of California. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/30/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Sherwin-Williams Company The identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Thurlow, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sherwin-Williams Company The, identifying None. (Thurlow, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Sherwin-Williams Company The. (Thurlow, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18PSCV00136 Receipt No: 0973-23024382 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Sherwin-Williams Company The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Matthew David Thurlow added to party Sherwin-Williams Company The(pty:dft))(Thurlow, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California v. The Sherwin-Williams Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwin-Williams Company The
Represented By: Matthew David Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Matthew David Thurlow
Represented By: Theodore J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Coast Air Quality Management District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: William B Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?