Aram Adzhikosyan v. CallFire, Inc.

Plaintiff: Aram Adzhikosyan
Defendant: CallFire, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00246
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Pro Hac Vice Application #11 , for the following reasons: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other: No proposed order. No Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (bm)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #10 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant's stipulation is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this entire action is stayed for 180 days. If the FCC issues guidance clarifying the ATDS definition before the expiration of 180 days, either party may move to lift the stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines in this case, including Plaintiff's deadline to file a motion for class certification pursuant to Local Rule 23-3, are continued until dates to be determined at a scheduling conference after the stay has been lifted. (bm)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. Hazzard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CallFire, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23200334) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CallFire, Inc., (Rossum, Ann)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ann T Rossum counsel for Defendant CallFire, Inc.. Adding Ann T. Rossum as counsel of record for CallFire, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendant. (Attorney Ann T Rossum added to party CallFire, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rossum, Ann)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 2/19/19. APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. Hazzard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CallFire, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23200334) filed by Defendant CallFire, Inc.. (O'Connor, Cheryl) Modified on 2/20/2019 (bm).
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Federal Communications Commission Issues Guidance Clarifying the Definition of "automated telephone dialing system" ("ATDS") under the Telephone Consumer Protection Action ("TCPA") filed by Defendant CallFire, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay the Case)(Attorney Cheryl L O'Connor added to party CallFire, Inc.(pty:dft))(O'Connor, Cheryl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aram Adzhikosyan, upon Defendant CallFire, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service via Becky DeGeorge, authorized person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Amini, Mona)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant CallFire, Inc. (ghap)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Aram Adzhikosyan. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Aram Adzhikosyan, identifying Defendant CallFire, Inc.. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Aram Adzhikosyan. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23026899 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Aram Adzhikosyan. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Aram Adzhikosyan(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aram Adzhikosyan v. CallFire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aram Adzhikosyan
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Mona Amini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallFire, Inc.
Represented By: Ann T Rossum
Represented By: Cheryl L O'Connor
Represented By: Michael B Hazzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?