Sheila Biglang-Awa v. The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sheila Biglang-Awa
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC, The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00253
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Charles F Eick
1 Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of address by Joseph Richard Manning, Jr attorney for Plaintiff Sheila Biglang-Awa. Changing attorneys address to 20062 SW Birch Street, Suite 200, Newport Beach, CA 92660. Filed by Plaintiff Sheila Biglang-Awa. (Manning, Joseph)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for April 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/22/2019. (sw)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Exhibit (non-trial) #3 served on January 14, 2019. (Sommer, Andrew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC identifying Marriott International, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Sommer, Andrew)
January 11, 2019 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
January 11, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Sheila Biglang-Awa. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/5/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap) Modified on 1/15/2019 (ghap).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC. as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Sommer, Andrew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC. (Sommer, Andrew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18VECV00265 Receipt No: 0973-23031772 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC. (Attorney Andrew J Sommer added to party The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC(pty:dft))(Sommer, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheila Biglang-Awa v. The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Biglang-Awa
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Represented By: Michael John Manning
Represented By: Tristan Paul Jankowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?