Ann Koplow v. St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ann Koplow
Defendant: St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. and Abbott Laboratories
Case Number: 2:2019cv00309
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #16 by Judge Dale S. Fischer, the deadline for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc., to respond to the Complaint is extended from 3/18/2019 to 5/2/2019. (jp)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 2, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Natasha Sung added to party Abbott Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Natasha Sung added to party St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.(pty:dft))(Sung, Natasha)
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Ann Koplow. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Natasha Sung. (Buche, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeff M. Meyerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ann Koplow (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23064386) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #12 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Jeff M. Meyerson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Ann Koplow, designating John K. Buche as local counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeff M. Meyerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ann Koplow (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23064386) filed by Plaintiff Ann Koplow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Buche, John)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Abbott Laboratories. (lh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeff M. Meyerson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. (lh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ann Koplow. (Buche, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ann Koplow. (Buche, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ann Koplow, (Buche, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ann Koplow. (Buche, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23046066 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ann Koplow. (Attorney John K Buche added to party Ann Koplow(pty:pla))(Buche, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ann Koplow v. St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.
Represented By: James David Bickham
Represented By: Lisa M Baird
Represented By: Natasha Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Natasha Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Koplow
Represented By: John K Buche
Represented By: Jeffrey M Meyerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?