Albert Solano, Sr. v. Stuart Sherman

Petitioner: Albert Solano, Sr.
Respondent: Stuart Sherman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00330
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Charles F Eick
1 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Respondent Stuart Sherman, Warden re Return to Habeas Petition (2254) #8 (Attachments: #1 LD1 Ventura Sup Ct docket #2014014749, #2 LD2 AOB B281707, #3 LD3 Petition Ventura # 2014014749, #4 LD4 Order Denying Petition Ventura # 2014014749, #5 LD5 opinion B281707, #6 LD6 petition for review S250274, #7 LD7 order denying review S250274)(Arambarri, Heather)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 filed by Respondent Stuart Sherman.(Arambarri, Heather)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Good cause appearing, It is Ordered that Respondent is granted a 30 day extension of time, to and including 3/11/19, in which to file an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner's Reply shall be filed and served within 15 days of the Answer's filing date. (sp)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 First APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DECLARATION OF HEATHER B. ARAMBARRI IN SUPPORT THEREOF; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Respondent Stuart Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Heather Bushman Arambarri added to party Stuart Sherman(pty:res)) (Arambarri, Heather)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon Respondent's attorneys, a copy of every future pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. (See document.) (sbou)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: that Respondent Stuart Sherman file Answer to the Petition not later than 2/9/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Albert Solano, Sr. (lh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Albert Solano, Sr. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert Solano, Sr. v. Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Albert Solano, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stuart Sherman
Represented By: Heather Bushman Arambarri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?