Kenneth Wayne Mills v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Mills
Defendant: Rubin, Department of Justice, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and California Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2019cv00373
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES AND CLOSING CASE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. On February 24, 2019, the Court DENIED plaintiff's request to file the action without prepayment of the full filing fee with leave to amend. Plaintiff was advised to resubmit the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Complaint with a certified copy of the Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization within 30 days, and failure to do so would result in closure of the case. Plaintiff has failed to submit a timely response. Accordingly, the Request to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees is DENIED and the case is closed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: DENYING #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court,if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (shb)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency. On 1/16/2019, the Court received, through the United States Mail, a complaint arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Please be advised that the Court and California State Prison, Los Angeles County (LAC) are participants in a pilot project that requires all such documents to be scanned and submitted to the Court by electronic mail, General Order No. 18-02. Submission of this complaint by U.S. Mail violates the terms of General Order 18-02. To submit a complaint arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983 to the Court for filing, you must present it to designated LAC staff for scanning and emailing to the Court. If you are unable to comply with these procedures, you must submit with your complaint a motion for leave to file your documents by U.S. Mail that demonstrates good cause for your inability to submit your documents to the Court electronically. You must now re-submit your complaint to the Court electronically. You must submit for scanning an exact copy of the complaint you previously mailed to the Court; it cannot be modified in any way. You must include this notice on top of the complaint submitted for scanning. If your complaint is received in the Court's electronic mail box within two weeks from the date of this letter, your complaint will be deemed filed as of the date that appears on the envelope you originally sent via U.S. Mail. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (ghap)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Kenneth Wayne Mills. The Petitioner does not consent. (ghap)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner filed by plaintiff Kenneth Wayne Mills. (ghap)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants California Attorney General, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Department of Justice, Rubin pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato., filed by plaintiff Kenneth Wayne Mills. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Part 2 of Civil Rights Complaint) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Wayne Mills v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?