Arturo Prieto v. Charter Communications, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Arturo Prieto
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00383
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC.(Carr, Joseph)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Joseph W. Ozmer II of Lead Trial Counsel re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Ozmer, Joseph)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for February 25, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before February 13, 2019. (iv)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
January 17, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2)(ghap)
January 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Charter Communications, LLC, Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Arturo Prieto. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/17/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC, (Carr, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Carr, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18STCV08732 Receipt No: 0973-23060842 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Answer), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Carr Declaration)) (Attorney Joseph Scott Carr added to party Charter Communications, LLC(pty:dft))(Carr, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arturo Prieto v. Charter Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Scott Carr
Represented By: Kristapor Vartanian
Represented By: Joseph W Ozmer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Prieto
Represented By: Yoonis J Han
Represented By: Anthony Choe
Represented By: Sam K Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?