Ladell Stephens v. Fernandez et al

Plaintiff: Ladell Stephens
Defendant: Dr. Narian and Dr. Fernandez
Case Number: 2:2019cv00384
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Second SUPPLEMENT to Amended Complaint #6 filed by Plaintiff Ladell Stephens. (hr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Amended Complaint #6 filed by Plaintiff Ladell Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, Part 2)(hr)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Fernandez, Narian amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Ladell Stephens(hr)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. If Plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order within which to file a First Amended Complaint or a signed Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $0 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (hr)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Ladell Stephens. (ghap)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Fernandez, Narian pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Stevenson., filed by plaintiff Ladell Stephens. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ladell Stephens v. Fernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Narian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladell Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?