Rocio Monarrez v. Wal Mart Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rocio Monarrez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc., DOES 1 to 20, inclusive and Wal Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00411
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rocio Monarrez, identifying Rocio Monarrez and Walt-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Nalbandyan, Akop)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Akop Jacob Nalbandyan counsel for Plaintiff Rocio Monarrez. Ruben Limonjyan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Rocio Monarrez. (Nalbandyan, Akop)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for May 6, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/29/2019. (sw)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wal Mart Associates, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Declaration #3 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 served on 01/22/2019. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
January 18, 2019 NON CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Wal Mart Associates, attached as Exhibit C.(jtil)
January 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rocio Monarrez in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/12/2018, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Inc., (Wrosch, Mitchell)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Inc. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Mitchell A. Wrosch re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV08235 Receipt No: 0973-23065617 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Inc.. (Attorney Mitchell A Wrosch added to party Wal-Mart Inc.(pty:dft))(Wrosch, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocio Monarrez v. Wal Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell A Wrosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell A Wrosch
Represented By: Pooja Virendra Patel
Represented By: Cheryl Johnson-Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocio Monarrez
Represented By: Ruben Limonjyan
Represented By: Akop Jacob Nalbandyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?