Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company and Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
3Rd Party Plaintiff: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. and UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd.
3Rd Party Defendant: Roes and Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00413
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Andre Birotte
1 Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #15 as to Third-Party Defendant Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd. (jp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #15 filed by defendants UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Estrella, Mark)
March 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Third Party Complaint #15 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The phrase "et. al," should not be used on the Summons form. Summons caption is not identical to the Third Party Complaint. Separate attachments should clearly identify which sections of the summons the attachments belong to. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #15 filed by defendant UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Estrella, Mark)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Third Party Plaintiffs UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. EXHIBIT "B" as to Third Party Complaint #15 . (Estrella, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Third Party Plaintiffs UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. EXHIBIT "A" as to Third Party Complaint #15 . (Estrella, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., Roes, filed by Defendants UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc..(Estrella, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. and UPINSCO. (Estrella, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Defendants UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Mark P Estrella added to party UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark P Estrella added to party UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Estrella, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #10 as to Defendant UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd. (gk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Cammarano, Dennis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity and Liability Company(Cammarano, Dennis)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, upon Defendant UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cammarano, Dennis)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (ghap)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, (Cammarano, Dennis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Cammarano, Dennis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Cammarano, Dennis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23066176 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attorney Dennis A Cammarano added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company(pty:pla))(Cammarano, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P Estrella
Represented By: Michael S McDaniel
Represented By: Christoph M Wahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Mark P Estrella
Represented By: Michael S McDaniel
Represented By: Christoph M Wahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Dennis A Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Represented By: Dennis A Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?