Heidi Marsh v. Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury
Plaintiff: Heidi Marsh
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 2:2019cv00587
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6213
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassignment Pursuant to General Order 16-05 filed on 2/20/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-587-DMG (SSx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00587 DMG(SSx). (rn)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Heidi Marsh, (esa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury. (esa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury.Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Susan H. Segal, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by plaintiff Heidi Marsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heidi Marsh v. Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?