Atari Interactive, Inc. v. Hyperkin Inc.
Plaintiff: Atari Interactive, Inc.
Defendant: Hyperkin Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00608
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder:ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR MAY 13, 2019, at 11:00 a.m.The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan notlater than 21 days prior to the date of the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and to report to the Court not later than 14 days after they confer on a discovery plan and the other matters required by F.R.Civ.P. 26(f) and the Local Rules of this Court.Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS). (lc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyperkin Inc., (Attorney Lynda J Zadra-Symes added to party Hyperkin Inc.(pty:dft))(Zadra-Symes, Lynda)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The document is accepted as filed.Defendant must promptly file its Notice of Interested Parties. (lc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Hyperkin Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hyperkin Inc..(Champion, Jason)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyperkin Inc. answer now due 3/21/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Hyperkin Inc..(Attorney Jason Alexander Champion added to party Hyperkin Inc.(pty:dft))(Champion, Jason)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer chose the incorrect statute prompt as FRCP 5(b)(2)(D). Service of process was Not made on the Clerks Office of the USDC. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Atari Interactive, Inc., upon Defendant Hyperkin Inc. served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint, etc. (Lauritsen, Eric)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Form filed after case opening assigned case number: 2:19cv00608 CAS (AFMx). Form as to case number and date action filed is MISSING and or Left Blank. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Lauritsen, Eric)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Hyperkin Inc. (esa)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Atari Interactive, Inc., identifying Atari Interactive, Inc., A Delaware corporation and Hyperkin Inc., A California corporation. (Wesley, Keith)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Wesley, Keith)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23103125 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Atari Interactive, Inc.(pty:pla))(Wesley, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atari Interactive, Inc. v. Hyperkin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atari Interactive, Inc.
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: David D Kim
Represented By: Eric Carl Lauritsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyperkin Inc.
Represented By: Lynda J Zadra-Symes
Represented By: Jason Alexander Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?