William Leung et al v. China Southern Airlines Company Limited et al
Plaintiff: Jim Leung and William Leung
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive and China Southern Airlines Company Limited
Case Number: 2:2019cv00681
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 31 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited.. (Sutherland, Kevin)
March 22, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ELECTION OF PRIVATE MEDIATION filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited. (Sutherland, Kevin)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (lom)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. Counsel are directed to contact the private mediator of their choice to arrange a date and time for the mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 21, 2019. (lom)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report #24 and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Absent extraordinary circumstances, which must satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and be brought to the Court's attention in a timely manner, the Court will not modify these dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for March 11, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. This case is referred to the Court's Mediation Panel. Alternatively, the parties may agree to use the services of a private mediator. (lom)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Before the Court is a Motion to Remand (Docket No. #16 ) filed by plaintiffs Jim Leung and William Leung, by and through his guardian ad litem Christopher Allan Bury (the Plaintiffs). Based on the foregoing, the Court denies Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand without prejudice to Plaintiffs joining defendants in the future who destroy complete diversity. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION to Remand Case #16 and the Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on March 11, 2019 are hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited.. (Sutherland, Kevin)
February 18, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY in support of Remand Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Plaintiffs Jim Leung, William Leung. (Yarris, Ronald)
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 CORRECTED filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited. (Sutherland, Kevin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Christian T. Johnson in opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited. (Sutherland, Kevin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited. (Sutherland, Kevin)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 10:30 AM has been reset for 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #17 APPLICATION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Christopher Allan Bury as Guardian ad Litem for plaintiff William Leung. (mrgo)
February 10, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Appointment of Christopher Allan Bury as Guardian ad Litem for William Leung filed by plaintiff William Leung. Application set for hearing on 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yarris, Ronald)
February 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiffs Jim Leung, William Leung. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yarris, Ronald)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Before the Court is an Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed by plaintiffs William Leung and Jim Leung (the "Plaintiffs") on February 1, 2019. (Docket No. 11.) Nothing in Plaintiffs' Application alleviates the Court's concerns about the apparent conflict of interest between Jim Leung in his capacity as a plaintiff in this action and his role as the guardian ad litem for his son William Leung. The Court concludes, to avoid the apparent conflict of interest, that William Leung should be represented by a guardian ad litem who does not have a financial interest in the outcome of this litigation. Therefore, the Court vacates the superior court's appointment of Jim Leungas guardian ad litem for William Leung. Out of an abundance of caution, this Court extends Plaintiffs' deadline to file an Application for Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem who is not Jim Leung and does not have a conflict of interest to March 13, 2019. As the Court previously mentioned, Plaintiffs may want to consider seeking appointment of a guardian ad litem from the Probate Volunteer Panel of the Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
February 2, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of ronald yarris re guardian ad litem order granted in State Court filed by Plaintiff Jim Leung. (Yarris, Ronald)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Yarris, Ronald)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ronald Alan Yarris on behalf of Plaintiffs Jim Leung, William Leung (Yarris, Ronald)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 (Yarris, Ronald)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited, re Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form, #3 , Order #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on January 31, 2019. (Sutherland, Kevin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited.(Sutherland, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Upon reviewing the Los Angeles Superior Court's docket, it appears as though Plaintiffs filed an application and order for appointment of plaintiff Jim Leung as guardian ad litem to William Leung on December 18, 2018, but it does not appear as though the superior court ruled on Plaintiffs' application. The Court notes that because Jim Leung is also a named plaintiff in this action and is pursuing his own claims, the Court is concerned that his appointment as William Leung's guardian ad litem may create a conflict of interest. The Court, therefore, orders Plaintiffs to file an Application for Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem who does not have a conflict of interest by February 27, 2019. Plaintiffs may want to consider seeking appointment of a guardian ad litem from the Probate Volunteer Panel of the Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Steve Kim. New Case Number 2:19-cv-00681 PA(SKx). (ghap)
January 25, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants China Southern Airlines Company Limited, Does 1-50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs William Leung, Jim Leung. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/19/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
January 25, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Leung, Jim Leung, upon Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lingzhi He, authorized agent for service of corporate defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited, identifying China Southern; China Southern Air Holding Company; Nan Lung Holding Limited; The People's Republic of China. (Sutherland, Kevin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18STCV05474 Receipt No: 0973-23102914 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant China Southern Airlines Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Christian T. Johnson In Support of Notice of Removal including all State Court filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Kevin R Sutherland added to party China Southern Airlines Company Limited(pty:dft))(Sutherland, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Leung et al v. China Southern Airlines Company Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Leung
Represented By: Ronald Alan Yarris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Leung
Represented By: Ronald Alan Yarris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Southern Airlines Company Limited
Represented By: Christian Troy Johnson
Represented By: Kevin R Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?