Donnell Shell v. L.A. Superior Court
Petitioner: Donnell Shell
Respondent: L.A. Superior Court
Case Number: 2:2019cv00692
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38 Letter re Habeas Corpus Transfer-in) (et)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Western Division*.*312 N. Spring Street**Los Angeles, CA 90012*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (CA Atty General Served) (anh). (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Donnell Shell. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/25/2019 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major Accepting Document: Letter, from Petitioner Donnell Shell. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/25/2019. Signed by the chambers of Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/29/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by Donnell Shell re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donnell Shell. (jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against L.A. Superior Court, filed by Donnell Shell.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2840-CAB-KSC. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening] (jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donnell Shell v. L.A. Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L.A. Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donnell Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?