Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. Apex Maritime Co., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company and Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Defendant: Apex Maritime Co., Inc. doing business as Apex Shipping Co. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Apex Maritime Co., Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Evergreen Marine Corp. (Taiwan) Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00796
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #15 as to Third-Party Defendant Evergreen Marine Corp. (Taiwan) Ltd. (jp)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #15 filed by third-party plaintiff Apex Maritime Co., Inc.. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against third-party defendant Evergreen Marine Corp. (Taiwan) Ltd., filed by third-party plaintiff Apex Maritime Co., Inc..(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Apex Maritime Co., Inc., identifying TT Club Mutual Insurance Limited. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Apex Maritime Co., Inc..(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-00796 DSF(SKx). (rn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apex Maritime Co., Inc. answer now due 4/1/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Apex Maritime Co., Inc..(Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Apex Maritime Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Cammarano, Dennis)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, upon Defendant Apex Maritime Co., Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vicky Cheung, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cammarano, Dennis)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apex Maritime Co., Inc. (car)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, (Cammarano, Dennis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Cammarano, Dennis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Cammarano, Dennis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23142491 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attorney Dennis A Cammarano added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company(pty:pla))(Cammarano, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. Apex Maritime Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Maritime Co., Inc. doing business as Apex Shipping Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Dennis A Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Represented By: Dennis A Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Apex Maritime Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Evergreen Marine Corp. (Taiwan) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?