Monica Emerson v. Apple Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Monica Emerson
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and Apple Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00829
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isabelle Ord, #2 Proposed Order)(Ord, Isabelle)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #17 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #18 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raj N. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23329840) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application incomplete. Proposed Order is blank. (lt)
March 6, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple Inc. answer now due 4/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Apple Inc..(Ord, Isabelle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric M. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23329939) filed by defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Corea, Hector)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raj N. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23329840) filed by defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Corea, Hector)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hector Emilio Corea on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Attorney Hector Emilio Corea added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft))(Corea, Hector)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Isabelle Louise Ord on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft))(Ord, Isabelle)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER VACATING DOCUMENT NO. #13 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***VACATED PURSUANT TO DOCUMENT NO. 14 ***ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (vv) Modified on 2/8/2019 (vv).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00829 DSF(Ex). (rn)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00829 CBM(Ex). (rn)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-00829 RSWL(Ex). (rn)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apple Inc. (et)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Monica Emerson. (Friedman, Todd)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Monica Emerson, (Friedman, Todd)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Monica Emerson. (Friedman, Todd)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23150573 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Monica Emerson. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Monica Emerson(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monica Emerson v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Isabelle Louise Ord
Represented By: Eric M Roberts
Represented By: Raj N Shah
Represented By: Hector Emilio Corea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Emerson
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?