Anthony J. Ugliano v. St. Jude Medical Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Ugliano
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter Inc, St. Jude Medical Inc, Pacesetter Inc., St. Jude Medical Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive and Pacesetter Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as St. Jude Cardiac Rhythm Manaagement Division
Case Number: 2:2019cv00834
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew E. Tauber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter Inc., St. Jude Medical Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23497328) filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter Inc., St. Jude Medical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Double, Robert)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for July 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019. (sw)
April 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter Inc., St. Jude Medical Inc., identifying Anthony J. Ugliano, St. Jude Medical, LLC, Pacesetter, Inc., and Abbott Laboratories. (Double, Robert)
April 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter Inc., St. Jude Medical Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Robert C. Double III In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A - Notice of Premarket Approval, #4 Exhibit B - Form 8-K, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #6 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice) (Double, Robert)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 , for the following reasons: (1) Case number is incorrect or missing. (2) Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (3) Single spaced text at page 3 (LR 11-3.6) Counsel shall refile the motion by 3pm on April 2, 2019 and shall notice the motion for hearing on MAY 6, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (jp)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 4/2/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 21] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter Inc., St. Jude Medical Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Robert C. Double III in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A - Notice of Premarket Approval, #4 Exhibit B - Form 8-K, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #6 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice) (Double, Robert) Modified on 4/2/2019 (jp).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DENIED ORDER BY THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Answer #18 . THE EX PARTE IS DENIED. NO GOOD CAUSE SHOWN. (jp)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/29/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter Inc., St. Jude Medical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Double, Robert)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #16 . THE STIPULATION IS DENIED. (jp)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 29, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haney, Steven)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #12 , for the following reasons: (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; (2) Requires order by the Court. No proposed order attached. (jp)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-00834 RGK(ASx). (rn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 3/26/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 15] STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 29, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano.(Haney, Steven) Modified on 3/26/2019 (jp).
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano, upon Defendant Pacesetter Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation; Agent for Service of Process for Pacesetter, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Haney, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano, upon Defendant Abbott Laboratories served on 2/7/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation: Agent for Service of Process for Abbott Laboratories in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Haney, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano, upon Defendant St. Jude Medical Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation; Agent for Service of Process for St. Jude Medical Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Haney, Steven)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pacesetter Inc. answer now due 3/29/2019; Abbott Laboratories answer now due 3/29/2019; St. Jude Medical Inc. answer now due 3/29/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Pacesetter Inc.; Abbott Laboratories; St. Jude Medical Inc..(Attorney Robert Chester Double added to party Abbott Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Chester Double added to party Pacesetter Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Chester Double added to party St. Jude Medical Inc.(pty:dft))(Double, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter Inc., St. Jude Medical Inc. (ghap)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano, (Haney, Steven)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano. (Haney, Steven)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano. (Haney, Steven)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23152520 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anthony J. Ugliano. (Attorney Steven H Haney added to party Anthony J. Ugliano(pty:pla))(Haney, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony J. Ugliano v. St. Jude Medical Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Robert Chester Double
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter Inc.
Represented By: Robert Chester Double
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical Inc.
Represented By: Robert Chester Double
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as St. Jude Cardiac Rhythm Manaagement Division
Represented By: Robert Chester Double
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Ugliano
Represented By: Steven H Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?