A.S. v. Sunflower Montessori School

Plaintiff: A. S.
Defendant: Sunflower Montessori School
Case Number: 2:2019cv00955
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 4/16/2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the defendant(s); or, Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. S., upon Defendant Sunflower Montessori School served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: ROSHANA RASHAD in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Redacted Documents re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #13 (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil coversheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 Request to Issue Summons, #5 Summons)(Uzeta, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Having reviewed Plaintiff's response #10 , the Court hereby orders that the clerk place the Complaint (Doc. No. 1), Civil Cover Sheet (Doc. No. 2), Certificate of Interest Parties (Doc. No. 3), Request for Clerk to Issue Summons (Doc. No. 4), and Summons (Doc. No. 9) UNSER SEAL until further order from this Court. Plaintiff shall file redacted version of said document within three days of this order. Further, because a proper representative under F.R.Civ.P. 17(c)(1) is suing on behalf of the minor Plaintiff, Plaintiff need not seek appointment of a guardian ad litem pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 17(c)(2). Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
February 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff A. S.to Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,, #7 and Request for Further Instruction from the Court (Uzeta, Michelle)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT - 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sunflower Montessori School. (car) ** DOCUMENT SEALED PURSUANT TO THE CIVIL MINUTES OF 2/25/2019 #13 ** Modified on 2/25/2019 (gk).
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Summons Request #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 . Other error(s) with document(s): It appears that the name of an individual known to be a minor is contained in documents filed with the Court. Fed R Civ P 5.2(a) requires that a minor's initials (as opposed to a minor's spell out-name) be used on documents filed with this Court, unless the Court orders otherwise. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (car)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 17-1. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT - Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Alexander Scholnick. (Uzeta, Michelle) ** DOCUMENT SEALED PURSUANT TO THE CIVIL MINUTES OF 2/25/2019 #13 ** Modified on 2/25/2019 (gk).
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT - CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alexander Scholnick, (Uzeta, Michelle) ** DOCUMENT SEALED PURSUANT TO THE CIVIL MINUTES OF 2/25/2019 #13 ** Modified on 2/25/2019 (gk).
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alexander Scholnick. (Uzeta, Michelle) ** DOCUMENT SEALED PURSUANT TO THE CIVIL MINUTES OF 2/25/2019 #13 ** Modified on 2/25/2019 (gk).
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT - COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23178126 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Alexander Scholnick. (Attorney Michelle Uzeta added to party Alexander Scholnick (pty:pla))(Uzeta, Michelle) ** DOCUMENT SEALED PURSUANT TO THE CIVIL MINUTES OF 2/25/2019 #13 ** Modified on 2/25/2019 (gk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.S. v. Sunflower Montessori School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunflower Montessori School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Michelle Uzeta
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?