Tania Wisbar Mahoney v. Brighthouse Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Tania Wisbar Mahoney
Defendant: Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, Does 1 to 50, inclusive and Integrated Marketing and Insurance Services, Inc.
Petitioner: Mahoney Wisbar Tania and Integrated Marketing & Insurance Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00994
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Fernando M Olguin
1 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 30 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Torrance. (iv)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #18 is granted.The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 825 Maple Avenue, Torrance, CA 90503, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
April 5, 2019 Filing 28 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial less than 15 days, filed by Plaintiff Tania Wisbar Mahoney.. (Bruce, Katherine)
April 5, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Tania Wisbar Mahoney(Bruce, Katherine)
April 5, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katherine A Bruce counsel for Plaintiff Tania Wisbar Mahoney. Adding Katherine A. Bruce as counsel of record for PLAINTIFF for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Tania Wisbar Mahoney. (Attorney Katherine A Bruce added to party Tania Wisbar Mahoney(pty:pla))(Bruce, Katherine)
April 2, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #16 , Motion to Remand #18 and Joinder #19 are taken off the 4/11/2019 calendar. No appearances are required on 4/11/2019. An order with the court's rulings will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action from Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #16 Defendant Integrated Marketing & Insurance Services, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Third Cause of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Integrated Marketing and Insurance Services, Inc.. (Tramontano, Alex)
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court -Torrance Courthouse #18 filed by Plaintiff Tania Wisbar Mahoney. (Charlin, Stephanie)
March 21, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court -Torrance Courthouse #18 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendant Brighthouse's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Cross Claimant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, Defendant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Parks LaMarche)(Duvall, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 21 Opposition to Defendant's re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action from Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #16 filed by Plaintiff Tania Wisbar Mahoney. (Fang, Joana)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #18 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action from Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #16 Brighthouse Life Insurance Company's Joinder In Integrated Marketing & Insurance Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Cross Claimant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, Defendant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court -Torrance Courthouse filed by PLAINTIFF Tania Wisbar Mahoney. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulated Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order) (Charlin, Stephanie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action from Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by defendant Integrated Marketing and Insurance Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex Tramontano, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Williamson, Ian)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: MOTION to Dismiss #14 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Defendant selected a motion date that is closed. (vdr)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 **MOTION STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Integrated Marketing and Insurance Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex Tramontano, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Williamson, Ian) Modified on 2/27/2019 (vdr).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: MOTION to Dismiss #12 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1, the notice of motion shall be filed with the Clerk not later than twenty-eight (28) days before the date set for hearing. (vdr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 **MOTION STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Integrated Marketing and Insurance Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex Tramontano) (Attorney Ian G Williamson added to party Integrated Marketing and Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Williamson, Ian) Modified on 2/26/2019 (vdr).
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 9 Honorable Fernando M. Olguin's Standing Order served on 2/25/2019. (Duvall, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
February 8, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF CROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendant Tania Wisbar Mahoney, filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (SEE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
February 8, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
February 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, Does 1 TO 50, inclusive, Integrated Marketing and Insurance Services, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Tania Wisbar Mahoney. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 2/8/2019. (Duvall, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Plaintiff That Action Has Been Removed to Federal Court filed by Defendant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company identifying Defendant as Corporate Parent. (Duvall, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, identifying Brighthouse Holdings, LLC and Brighthouse Holdings, LLC. (Duvall, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Torrance Superior Court, case number 18TRCV00197 Receipt No: 0973-23186835 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Attorney Michael J Duvall added to party Brighthouse Life Insurance Company(pty:bkmov))(Duvall, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tania Wisbar Mahoney v. Brighthouse Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mahoney Wisbar Tania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Integrated Marketing & Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighthouse Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J Duvall
Represented By: Ronald D Kent
Represented By: Justin Alan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Marketing and Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ian G Williamson
Represented By: Alex Joseph Tramontano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tania Wisbar Mahoney
Represented By: Brian S Kabateck
Represented By: Joana Fang
Represented By: Christopher B Noyes
Represented By: Stephanie E Charlin
Represented By: Katherine A Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?