Alejandra Vargo v. ULRS, Inc.

Plaintiff: Alejandra Vargo
Defendant: ULRS, Inc. and United Legal Group
Case Number: 2:2019cv00996
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
1 Judge: Karen E Scott
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement #13 filed March 29, 2019, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for July 1, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Vargo. (Volheim, Nathan)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will accept the following no later than April 1, 2019: BY DEFENDANT: RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. OR BY PLAINTIFF: DEFAULT APPLICATION. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alejandra Vargo, upon Defendant ULRS, Inc. served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Person Designated by Law to Accept Service of Process on Behalf of Defendant, Would Not Give Real Name in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Wajda, Nicholas)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: GRANTING #5 Non-Resident Attorney Nathan C. Volheim APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Nicholas M. Wajda as local counsel. (lt)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00996 MWF(KESx). (rn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant ULRS, Inc. (et)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan Charles Volheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alejandra Vargo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23187576) filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Vargo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wajda, Nicholas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Vargo, (Wajda, Nicholas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Vargo. (Wajda, Nicholas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Vargo. (Wajda, Nicholas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23187544 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Vargo. (Attorney Nicholas M Wajda added to party Alejandra Vargo(pty:pla))(Wajda, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alejandra Vargo v. ULRS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULRS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Legal Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Vargo
Represented By: Nathan C Volheim
Represented By: Nicholas M Wajda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?