Brian Whitaker v. Shlomo Botach et al

Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc. and Shlomo Botach
Case Number: 2:2019cv00997
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Order to Show Cause, #15 (Seabock, Christopher)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Christopher A. Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attorney Christopher A Seabock added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Seabock, Christopher)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 4/5/2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant Shlomo Botach. (SEE CIVIL MINUTE FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement #13 , filed on March 28, 2019. The parties are hereby notified that they are not relieved of any deadlines or court appearances until a dismissal of the action is filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc., a California Non-Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation. (jp)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc. filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Shlomo Botach served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Front Desk Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc. served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process - Daniel Michael Sosa in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Shlomo Botach, Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc. (esa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Carson, Chris)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23187838 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Shlomo Botach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid City Cannabis Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shlomo Botach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?