Brian Whitaker v. Mace 26, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Mace 26, LLC, Atef A. Malabeh and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv00998
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Dale S Fischer
1 Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Mace 26, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (jp)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Atef A. Malabeh. (jp)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Mace 26, LLC filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Atef A. Malabeh filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Mace 26, LLC served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: AVNER COHEN in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Atef A. Malabeh served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Mace 26, LLC, Atef A. Malabeh. (esa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Carson, Chris)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23188037 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Mace 26, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mace 26, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atef A. Malabeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?