Data Scape Limited v. Teradata Operations, Inc.

Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Defendant: Teradata Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01002
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney George Hopkins Guy, III counsel for Defendant Teradata Operations, Inc.. Adding G. Hopkins Guy, III as counsel of record for Teradata Operations, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attorney George Hopkins Guy, III added to party Teradata Operations, Inc.(pty:dft))(Guy, George)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #16 , by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Having considered the parties' Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and finding that it is supported by good cause, the Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation. Defendant Teradata Operations, Inc. shall have up to and including May 6, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (bm)
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Teradata Operations, Inc. answer now due 5/6/2019, filed by Defendant Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallegos, Hector)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Teradata Operations, Inc. answer now due 4/5/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Teradata Operations, Inc..(Attorney Hector G Gallegos added to party Teradata Operations, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gallegos, Hector)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-01002 PSG(RAOx). (rn)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01002 PA (RAOx). (esa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, upon Defendant Teradata Operations, Inc. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DAISY MONTENEGRO, REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge R. Gary Klausner, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-10658 RGK(AGRx) (rn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Teradata Operations, Inc. (et)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23190577 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Data Scape Limited v. Teradata Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: C Jay Chung
Represented By: Paul A Kroeger
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Philip X Wang
Represented By: Brian D Ledahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teradata Operations, Inc.
Represented By: George Hopkins Guy, III
Represented By: Hector G Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?