Steven Choi v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Steven Choi
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv01028
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Cormac J Carney
1 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiffs counsel, to show cause in writing no later than April 18, 2019 at noon, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution for failure to file a joint report (FRCivP 26). As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Filing of the parties' Joint Report (FRCivP 26). The Court may dismiss the action prior to the expiration of such time, however, if plaintiffs have not diligently prosecuted the action. (iv)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on April 12, 2019. (gga)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
February 11, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 #1 . (et)
February 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC., Does 1 to 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Steven Choi. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/12/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Jury Demand #4 served on February 11, 2019. (Tarczy, Benjamin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Tarczy, Benjamin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler North America Corporation. (Tarczy, Benjamin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Tarczy, Benjamin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 18STCV00317 Receipt No: 0973-23195362 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint of Steven Choi, #2 Exhibit State Court Answer of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC) (Attorney Benjamin Patrick Tarczy added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Tarczy, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Choi v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Tarczy
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Represented By: Benson Yeager Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Choi
Represented By: Isaac Kohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?