Lauretta Messner v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lauretta Messner
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D., Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation, DOES 1 through 20, inclusive, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson
Case Number: 2:2019cv01030
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Texas, 3:19-cv-00657 filed 3/18/2019. (iv)
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 Conditional Transfer Order - 311 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 03/14/2019 to 04/25/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. answer now due 3/21/2019; Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation answer now due 3/21/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D.; Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation.(Attorney Christopher P Norton added to party Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher P Norton added to party Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation(pty:dft))(Norton, Christopher)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Jacqueline Chooljian, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court sets a Status Conference for March 14, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01030 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Wendy R. Fleishman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
February 11, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lauretta Messner, upon Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; DePuy Synthes, Inc. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; Johnson and Johnson served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew Ekdahl, President, Alex Gorsky, CEO in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and email service on a individual, domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
February 11, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Does 1 through 20, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc., Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D., Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Lauretta Messner. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. Transferred to Judge Wu (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 8 of Notice of Related Cases, #2 Part 2 of 8 of Notice of Related Cases, #3 Part 3 of 8 of Notice of Related Cases, #4 Part 4 of 8 of Notice of Related Cases, #5 Part 5 of 8 of Notice of Related Cases, #6 Part 6 of 8 of Notice of Related Cases, #7 Part 7 of 8 of Notice of Related Cases, #8 Part 8 of 8 of Notice of Related Cases)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., identifying Johnson & Johnson International. (Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV04551 Receipt No: 0973-23195789 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party DePuy Synthes, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauretta Messner v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Represented By: David C Allen
Represented By: Kelley S Olah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D.
Represented By: Christopher P Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation
Represented By: Christopher P Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Represented By: David C Allen
Represented By: Kelley S Olah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: David C Allen
Represented By: Kelley S Olah
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: David C Allen
Represented By: Kelley S Olah
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauretta Messner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Gia Nguyen
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Robert J Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?