Eric Hodonsky v. Allstate Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Eric Hodonsky
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnirty Company, Allstate Insurance Co, Allstate Insurance Company of California, Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv01049
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (lc)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIALS) by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES; Jury Trial: 4/28/20 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 4/23/20; Hearing on Motions in limine: 4/20/20 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 4/6/20 1:30 PM; File Motions in Limine: 4/6/20 ; File oppositions to motions in limine: 4/13/20 ; File Proposed Pretrial Conference Order, Memoranda and Contentions of Fact and Law, Joint Witness List, Joint Exhibit List and Exhibit Stipulation, Proposed Verdict Form(s), Proposed Jury Instructions / Disputed Jury Instructions, Proposed Voir Dire Questions, Joint Statement of the Case, Joint Status Report re: Settlement: 3/30/20; Deadline for hearing motions: 2/10/20;Deadline to Conduct Settlement Conference: 2/3/20; Expert discovery cutoff: 1/24/20; Percipient/Fact discovery cutoff: 12/16/19; deadline to amend: 6/11/19. (lc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company of California, Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Feldman, Marc)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL FRCP 16, 26(F) ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This case has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Otis D. Wright II. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/18/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. See document for details. (smo)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
February 12, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company of California, Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/11/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL](lh)
February 12, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company of California, Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company, Does 1 through 50. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Eric Hodonsky. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/16/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Glen Davis re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Allstate Insurance Co, Allstate Insurance Company of California, Allstate Northbrook Indemnirty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Feldman, Marc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Co, Allstate Insurance Company of California, Allstate Northbrook Indemnirty Company, identifying Allstate Corporation. (Feldman, Marc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Allstate Insurance Co, Allstate Insurance Company of California, Allstate Northbrook Indemnirty Company. (Feldman, Marc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior, case number EC069155 Receipt No: 0973-23198251 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Allstate Northbrook Indemnirty Company, Allstate Insurance Company of California, Allstate Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Los Angeles Superior Court Complaint, #2 Los Angeles Superior Court Answer, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Marc J Feldman added to party Allstate Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Marc J Feldman added to party Allstate Insurance Company of California(pty:dft), Attorney Marc J Feldman added to party Allstate Northbrook Indemnirty Company(pty:dft))(Feldman, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Hodonsky v. Allstate Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hodonsky
Represented By: Matthew P Malczynski
Represented By: Glenn E Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnirty Company
Represented By: Marc J Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Represented By: Marc J Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company of California
Represented By: Marc J Feldman
Represented By: Peter H Klee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
Represented By: Peter H Klee
Represented By: Marc J Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter H Klee
Represented By: Marc J Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?