Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Maersk Line A S et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Maersk Line A/S, Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. dba Expeditors International Ocean, Maersk Line A S and Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01054
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. answer now due 4/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Expeditors International of Washington, Inc..(Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maersk Line A S answer now due 4/13/2019, filed by Defendant Maersk Line A S.(Attorney B Alexander Moghaddam added to party Maersk Line A S(pty:dft))(Moghaddam, B)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tricia Rusano - Registered Agent Solutions, Inc. - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ou, Chih)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Maersk Line A S served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro - CT Corporation System - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ou, Chih)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. (et)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maersk Line A S. (et)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, identifying Dan Dee International Corporation. (Ou, Chih)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Ou, Chih)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Ou, Chih)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Ou, Chih)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23200384 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attorney Chih Yu Ou added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla))(Ou, Chih)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Maersk Line A S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. dba Expeditors International Ocean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line A S
Represented By: B Alexander Moghaddam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Chih Yu Ou
Represented By: Joshua A Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?