Antonio Fernandez v. ALJ Investment Co., LLC et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Eunice Young Pak, Does 1-10 and ALJ Investment Co., LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01169
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant ALJ Investment Co., LLC #9 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Time to respond has not expired. A stipulation extending time for defendant to file an answer to 4/25/2019 was filed. (gk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ALJ Investment Co., LLC answer now due 4/25/2019, filed by defendant ALJ Investment Co., LLC.(Attorney Peter Andrew Kim added to party ALJ Investment Co., LLC(pty:dft))(Kim, Peter)
April 7, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant ALJ Investment Co., LLC filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Eunice Young Pak served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe (Person in charge) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant ALJ Investment Co., LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: GENE DUNGNO LEE in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants ALJ Investment Co., LLC, Eunice Young Pak. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220955 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. ALJ Investment Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eunice Young Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALJ Investment Co., LLC
Represented By: Peter Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?