Luis Marquez v. R. R. Kellogg, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Luis Marquez
Defendant: Does 1-10 and R. R. Kellogg, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01170
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to R. R. Kellogg, Inc answer now due 4/22/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant R. R. Kellogg, Inc.(Attorney Ryan Paul Tish added to party R. R. Kellogg, Inc(pty:dft))(Tish, Ryan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez, upon Defendant R. R. Kellogg, Inc served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: MICHAEL J DOBENS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rfi)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #7 as to Defendant R. R. Kellogg, Inc. (lh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 CORRECTED Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #7 filed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez. (lh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORRECTED CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez. (lh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 CORRECTED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez. (lh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against Defendants R. R. Kellogg, Inc., Does 1-10. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish.(Filing Fee $ 400 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez. (lh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of errata filed by plaintiff Luis Marquez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification and notice of interested parties, #4 Summons)(Carson, Chris)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Summons Request #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect documents are attached. The caption on the documents uploaded to the docket entries 1 - 4 do not match the case title information on the docket. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching the corrected version of the documents. (lh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Luis Marquez. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220978 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Luis Marquez. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Luis Marquez(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Marquez v. R. R. Kellogg, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. R. Kellogg, Inc
Represented By: Kenneth P Roberts
Represented By: Ryan Paul Tish
Represented By: Kevin Kanooni
Represented By: Michael Bruce Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Marquez
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?