Susan Buchanan v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: SUSAN BUCHANAN
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv01208
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jane W Cervantes on behalf of Plaintiff Susan Buchanan (Attorney Jane W Cervantes added to party Susan Buchanan(pty:pla))(Cervantes, Jane)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. See Local Rule 11-3.8 Title Page. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Susan Buchanan, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. A.. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E.A.. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, SSA. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed on Attorney General of USA, DOJ, #2 Summons Executed on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, SSA)(Zane, Helen)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Susan Buchanan. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Susan Buchanan(pty:pla))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Deny Pro Hac Vice Application #10 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The PHV Application (Dkt. 10) does not comply with Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 and is therefore DENIED. (see document for further details) (hr)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Susan Buchanan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23304180) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Interested Parties #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in the wrong case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Susan Buchanan, identifying Commissioner of Social Security. (Zane, Helen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Susan Buchanan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23304180) filed by Plaintiff Susan Buchanan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Zane, Helen)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. (see document for further details) (hr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Regional Chief Counsel). (esa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security (United States Attorney). (esa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney General of the USA). (esa) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/19/2019) (esa).
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SUSAN BUCHANAN, (Zane, Helen)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SUSAN BUCHANAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons USAG, #2 Proposed Summons USAO)(Zane, Helen)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SUSAN BUCHANAN. (Zane, Helen)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23229726 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SUSAN BUCHANAN. (Attorney Helen R Zane added to party SUSAN BUCHANAN(pty:pla))(Zane, Helen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Susan Buchanan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN BUCHANAN
Represented By: Helen R Zane
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Represented By: David F Chermol
Represented By: Jane W Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?