Angelina Dettamanti v. Timothy J. Staffel, et al

Plaintiff: Angelina Dettamanti
Defendant: Timothy J. Staffel and Does 1-50, inclusive
Petitioner: Timothy J Staffel
Case Number: 2:2019cv01230
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #30 filed by Angelina Dettamanti. CCA # 19-55272. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [See order for further details.] (car)
March 8, 2019 Filing 32 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-55272 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #30 as to Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (shb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 31 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
March 5, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,,,,, #29 . (Appeal Fee - In Forma Pauperis Request.) (Angelucci, Marc)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION FOR EMERGENCY TEMPORARY INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Ex Parte is DENIED, and the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (shb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Applications, Ex Parte Applications, Motions, Petitions, Requests - select - Application - select Proceed In Forma Pauperis attach the main document and the proposed order. Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing. The case number is 2:19-cv-01230-CBM (PLAx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 27 re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion #11 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fee waiver application)(Angelucci, Marc)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
February 26, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order #12 #13 #14 #15 #16 #17 #18 #19 #20 #21 #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Exhibits (non-trial). Other error(s) with document(s): Exhibits can be attached as secondary attachments to Ex Parte Application rather than filing it as individual documents. Also, to efile all Exhibits together, see Miscellaneous Filings (Other Documents) - Exhibit (non-trial). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01230 CBM (PLAx). (esa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Returned Unexecuted #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). Other error(s) with document(s): This event will calculate the time defendant's answer is due. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
February 24, 2019 Filing 22 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 20 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 19 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 17 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 16 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 15 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 12 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 24, 2019 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Vacate order rendering Dettamanti homeless . Motion filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 23, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. as to Timothy J. Staffel(individually). (Angelucci, Marc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Timothy J. Staffel(individually), Timothy J. Staffel(in his capacity as Judicial Officer of Santa Barbara Superior Court). (lc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti, (Angelucci, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti. (Angelucci, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23236288 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Angelina Dettamanti.(Angelucci, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angelina Dettamanti v. Timothy J. Staffel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Dettamanti
Represented By: Marc E Angelucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy J Staffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Staffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?