Hernandez v. County of Ventura et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Hernandez
Defendant: Gregory Guilin, County of Ventura, Dylan Foley, Tyler Ebell, Oren Ryerson and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv01302
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Tyler Ebell, Dylan Foley, Gregory Guilin, Oren Ryerson. (Zambito, Rocco)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Tyler Ebell, Dylan Foley, Gregory Guilin, Oren Ryerson, (Zambito, Rocco)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Tyler Ebell, Dylan Foley, Gregory Guilin, Oren Ryerson.(Zambito, Rocco)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr counsel for Defendants County of Ventura, Tyler Ebell, Dylan Foley, Gregory Guilin, Oren Ryerson. Adding Rocco Zambito, Jr. as counsel of record for Defendants County of Ventura, Dylan Foley, Oren Ryerson, Gregory Guilin, and Tyler Ebell for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Dylan Foley, Oren Ryerson, Gregory Guilin, and Tyler Ebell. (Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft), Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party Tyler Ebell(pty:dft), Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party Dylan Foley(pty:dft), Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party Gregory Guilin(pty:dft), Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party Oren Ryerson(pty:dft))(Zambito, Rocco)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul B Beach counsel for Defendants County of Ventura, Tyler Ebell, Dylan Foley, Gregory Guilin, Oren Ryerson. Adding Paul B. Beach as counsel of record for Defendants County of Ventura, Dylan Foley, Oren Ryerson, Gregory Guilin, and Tyler Ebell for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Dylan Foley, Oren Ryerson, Gregory Guilin, and Tyler Ebell. (Attorney Paul B Beach added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party Tyler Ebell(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party Dylan Foley(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party Gregory Guilin(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party Oren Ryerson(pty:dft))(Beach, Paul)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tyler Ebell answer now due 4/12/2019; Oren Ryerson answer now due 4/12/2019; Dylan Foley answer now due 4/12/2019; County of Ventura answer now due 4/12/2019; Gregory Guilin answer now due 4/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Tyler Ebell; Oren Ryerson; Dylan Foley; County of Ventura; Gregory Guilin.(Attorney James S Eicher added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft), Attorney James S Eicher added to party Tyler Ebell(pty:dft), Attorney James S Eicher added to party Dylan Foley(pty:dft), Attorney James S Eicher added to party Gregory Guilin(pty:dft), Attorney James S Eicher added to party Oren Ryerson(pty:dft))(Eicher, James)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants County of Ventura, Tyler Ebell, Dylan Foley, Gregory Guilin, Oren Ryerson. (et)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Jury Demand #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Hernandez. (Segall-Gutierrez, James)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christopher Hernandez, (Segall-Gutierrez, James)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Christopher Hernandez.. (Segall-Gutierrez, James)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christopher Hernandez. (Segall-Gutierrez, James)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23250939 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Christopher Hernandez. (Attorney James Paul Segall-Gutierrez added to party Christopher Hernandez(pty:pla))(Segall-Gutierrez, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. County of Ventura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Guilin
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Represented By: James S Eicher
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ventura
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Represented By: James S Eicher
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Foley
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Represented By: James S Eicher
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Ebell
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Represented By: James S Eicher
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oren Ryerson
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Represented By: James S Eicher
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hernandez
Represented By: James Paul Segall-Gutierrez
Represented By: Gregory Paul Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?