Manuel Sotelo Murillo et al v. Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Manuel Renteria and Manuel Soleto Murillo
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01328
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiffs Manuel Soleto Murillo, Manuel Renteria(Cara, Anthony)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in its entirety. Each of the claims alleged in the Complaint fail to state a viable claim for relief. The Court therefore dismisses the Complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed by no later than April 15, 2019. (See document for full details) (mrgo)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (Discovery cut-off 11/4/2019. Motions due by 11/4/2019. Bench Trial set for 1/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Percy Anderson, re REQUEST to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference #15 . ***A hearing will not be necessary. Denied as moot. (mrgo)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING by Judge Percy Anderson re: #14 REQUEST. ***No hearing will be required. Denied as moot. (mrgo)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for April 1, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. Defendant's counsel's request to appear by telephone at the scheduling conference (Docket No. 15) is denied as moot. (mrgo)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than November 18, 2019. (shb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference) (Tom, Meagan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST to Appear by Telephone at Motion to Dismiss Hearing filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request to Appear by Telephone at Motion to Dismiss Hearing) (Tom, Meagan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc... (Tom, Meagan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #8 filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.. (Tom, Meagan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #8 filed by Plaintiffs Manuel Soleto Murillo, Manuel Renteria. (Cara, Anthony)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #8 (Tom, Meagan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #8 filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.. (Tom, Meagan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Tom, Meagan)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. (See order for further details) (yl)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc., served on 2/22/19. (Tom, Meagan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
February 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, Homebridge Financial Services, Inc., filed by plaintiffs Manuel Soleto Murillo, Manuel Renteria. (Filed in state court 1/10/2019, submitted as document 1, p. 8) (esa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc., (Tom, Meagan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19PSCV00028 Receipt No: 0973-23255316 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Meagan S Tom added to party Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tom, Meagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel Sotelo Murillo et al v. Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Renteria
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Soleto Murillo
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?