Tenley Hardin v. Message Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tenley Hardin
Defendant: Message Communications, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Case Number: 2:2019cv02002
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Tenley Hardin. Dismissal is Without. (Friedman, Todd)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 7/3/2019.) (mrgo)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Message Communications, Inc. (ghap)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tenley Hardin, (Friedman, Todd)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tenley Hardin. (Friedman, Todd)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tenley Hardin. (Friedman, Todd)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23394595 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tenley Hardin. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Tenley Hardin(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenley Hardin v. Message Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Message Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenley Hardin
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?