William A. Masters v. Xavier Becerra
Plaintiff: William A. Masters
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 2:2019cv02030
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
2 Judge: John F Walter
3 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT NOTICE filed by Plaintiff William A. Masters. (iv)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS is Denied by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, re Appeal Referral #23 . (mat)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REFERRING MATTER #23 TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROSENBERG FOR A RECOMMENDATION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court having received the Referral Notice re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, refers the matter to Magistrate Judge Rosenberg for a recommendation. (iv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 REFERRAL NOTICE re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #21 RECEIVED from 9th Circuit Court. Referred to the District Court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. If the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral. If the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-55757 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #21 as to Plaintiff William A. Masters. (iv)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff William A. Masters. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #18 Filed On: 6/18/19; Entered On: 6/19/19; In forma pauperis was granted on 3/21/19, see item 6. (mat)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lara Haddad counsel for Defendant Xavier Becerra. Todd Grabarsky is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Xavier Becerra. (Haddad, Lara)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Lara Haddad on behalf of defendant Xavier Becerra. California Attorney General Todd Grabarsky terminated. (Attorney Lara Haddad added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Haddad, Lara)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT XAVIER BECERRAS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED without leave to amend. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER TAKING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #15 OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for June 17, 2019, is vacated and taken off calendar. (iv)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #15 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Grabarsky, Todd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Grabarsky, Todd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William A. Masters, upon Defendant William A. Masters served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (iv)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd Grabarsky on behalf of Defendant Xavier Becerra (Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Grabarsky, Todd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: CONSTITUTIONAL DUE PROCESS VIOLATION against Defendant Xavier Becerra amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff William A. Masters. (iv)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William A. Masters, upon Defendant Xavier Becerra served on 4/3/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was not served. The officer agency or corporation was served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (iv)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-02030 MWF(AGRx). (rn)
March 22, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. Re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . (vm)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Xavier Becerra. re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 (vm)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiff William A. Masters. (lh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties, filed by Plaintiff William A. Masters. (lh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Xavier Becerra. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Filed by Plaintiff William A. Masters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William A. Masters v. Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Todd Grabarsky
Represented By: Lara Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?